USA v. Nicholson et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00151-58679 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
133
05/21/2018
Modify Conditions of Release
05/23/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
137
05/31/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
138
06/05/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
140
07/02/2018
Unopposed Motion
141
07/02/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
07/13/2018
Docket Annotation re Non-Compliance with Fed. R. Cr. P. 49.1 (Text entry; no document attached.)
143
07/16/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
146
10/11/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
147
10/12/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
148
10/15/2018
Plea Agreement
149
10/15/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
150
10/16/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
154
10/17/2018
Plea Agreement
155
10/17/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
156
10/18/2018
Plea Agreement
157
10/18/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/19/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
158
10/18/2018
In Limine
159
10/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
162
10/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
163
10/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
164
10/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
165
10/19/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
10/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
170
10/22/2018
Continue
171
10/24/2018
Notice (Other)
172
10/24/2018
Plea Agreement
173
10/24/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
175
10/26/2018
Plea Agreement
176
10/26/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
177
10/26/2018
Plea Agreement
10/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
184
10/30/2018
Plea Agreement
185
10/30/2018
Errata
10/31/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
192
11/15/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
11/28/2018
Order on Motion in Limine (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
195
12/10/2018
Travel
196
12/10/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Order on Motion to Travel (Text entry; no document attached.)
199
12/17/2018
Remand
200
12/18/2018
Plea Agreement
201
12/18/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
12/18/2018
Order on Motion to Remand (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
205
12/20/2018
Forfeiture of Property
206
12/27/2018
Continue
207
12/27/2018
Declaration
208
12/27/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
12/31/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
210
12/31/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
211
12/31/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
212
12/31/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
213
12/31/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
214
01/09/2019
Continue
01/10/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
231
01/29/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
243
02/13/2019
Continue
02/18/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
250
02/28/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
254
03/04/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
03/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
265
03/18/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
266
03/18/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
03/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
268
03/20/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
269
03/20/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
03/22/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
272
03/24/2019
Supplement
273
03/25/2019
Supplement
03/25/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
274
03/25/2019
Notice (Other)
279
04/01/2019
Judgment
280
04/01/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.