USA v. Nickalaskey
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00179-58888 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
43
07/10/2018
Suppress
07/10/2018
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
07/10/2018
Hearing
07/16/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
07/17/2018
Response in Opposition
47
07/17/2018
Leave to File Document
48
07/17/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
49
07/24/2018
Continue
07/25/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
07/25/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
53
07/25/2018
Notice (Other)
08/06/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
09/11/2018
Transcript
09/12/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
10/02/2018
Report and Recommendation - Initial (Final R&R to follow)
60
10/16/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
10/16/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
10/23/2018
Notice (Other)
63
10/26/2018
Objection to Report and Recommendations
64
12/04/2018
Continue
12/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
12/10/2018
Report and Recommendation - Final
12/12/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
12/17/2018
Continue
12/18/2018
Order on Motion to Suppress (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
01/07/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
84
01/08/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
01/30/2019
Notice (Other)
02/04/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
02/10/2019
Notice (Other)
92
02/11/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
93
02/14/2019
Bail Review Hearing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.