USA v. Norman
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00175 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
23
06/04/2018
Unopposed Motion
24
06/07/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
06/07/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
06/20/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
27
06/20/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
28
06/20/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
29
06/20/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
06/27/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
06/29/2018
Forfeiture of Property
33
06/29/2018
Affidavit
34
07/02/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
35
07/02/2018
Judgment
36
07/02/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
37
07/02/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.