USA v. Numann
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00065 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
85
06/04/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
86
06/04/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
87
06/05/2018
Notice (Other)
88
06/07/2018
Notice (Other)
06/07/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
06/15/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
92
06/18/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
93
06/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
94
06/19/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
95
06/21/2018
USCA Case Number
96
06/21/2018
USCA Time Schedule Order
97
06/21/2018
Judgment
98
06/21/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
99
07/23/2018
USCA Order
07/31/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
09/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
102
09/24/2018
USCA Order
103
10/02/2018
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
104
10/02/2018
Designation of Record on Appeal
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.