USA v. Odell
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00145 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
91
05/30/2018
Continue
06/05/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
10/26/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
101
10/26/2018
Plea Agreement
102
10/26/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
11/05/2018
Forfeiture of Property
107
11/14/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.