USA v. Odell
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00145-58571 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
91
05/30/2018
Continue
06/05/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
10/26/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
101
10/26/2018
Plea Agreement
102
10/26/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
11/05/2018
Forfeiture of Property
107
11/14/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
108
12/12/2018
Forfeiture of Property
109
12/27/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
110
01/04/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
111
01/16/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
112
01/23/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
113
01/23/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
114
01/24/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
115
01/24/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
116
01/30/2019
Notice (Other)
02/01/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
119
02/04/2019
Notice (Other)
120
02/04/2019
Judgment
121
02/04/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
122
02/05/2019
Appoint Counsel
02/06/2019
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.