USA v. Owens
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2008-cr-00125-10316 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
81
04/18/2019
Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release
82
04/25/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
04/26/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
04/29/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
85
05/07/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.