USA v. Owens
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00026-59275 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
23
06/18/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
24
06/28/2018
Notice (Other)
25
07/23/2018
Continue
26
07/23/2018
Declaration
07/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
09/10/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
09/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
09/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
33
09/20/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
34
09/20/2018
Indictment - For Public
09/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
09/21/2018
Indictment - For Public
09/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
09/25/2018
Continue
09/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
09/26/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
10/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
11/21/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
11/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
12/17/2018
Plea Agreement
48
12/17/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
01/16/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
02/25/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
52
03/18/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
53
03/25/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
54
03/25/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
55
03/25/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
56
03/25/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
57
03/29/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
03/29/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
04/25/2019
Supplement
05/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
05/10/2019
Objection to Presentence Investigation Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.