USA v. Paleka
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00061-60045 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
20
05/18/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
21
05/22/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
22
06/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
23
06/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
07/19/2018
Unopposed Motion
30
07/20/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
31
07/26/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/27/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
08/02/2018
Suppress
34
08/02/2018
Suppress
08/06/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
08/08/2018
Unopposed Motion
37
08/08/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/10/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
08/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
41
08/17/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
08/20/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
08/20/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
45
08/20/2018
Response in Opposition
08/27/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
08/20/2018
Dismiss
49
08/30/2018
Criminal Judgment of Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.