USA v. Paulson
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:1987-cr-00013 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
144
05/22/2018
Order
145
06/12/2018
Order
146
06/26/2018
Order
147
07/05/2018
Status Report
148
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
151
09/10/2018
Order
152
11/14/2018
Order
153
11/26/2018
Order
154
12/17/2018
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.