USA v. Peralta
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2008-cr-00084 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
238
05/30/2018
Unopposed Motion
05/30/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
241
06/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
06/19/2018
Docket Annotation re Notice re Shortened Time Filing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
246
07/16/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
248
07/17/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
07/18/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
254
11/06/2018
Bail Review Hearing
255
11/06/2018
Order
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.