USA v. Perry
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00043-59709 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
05/31/2018
Notice (Other)
10
06/08/2018
Notice (Other)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/25/2018
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.