USA v. Peters et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

1:2017-cr-00012 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
99
05/23/2018
Unopposed Motion
05/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
05/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
102
05/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
103
05/25/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
104
05/25/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
105
05/25/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
106
05/25/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
06/05/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
109
06/11/2018
Judgment
110
06/11/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.