USA v. Phaymany et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00136 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
62
06/14/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
63
06/18/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
64
06/19/2018
Continue
65
06/19/2018
Affidavit
06/20/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
06/19/2018
Unopposed Motion
71
06/25/2018
Plea Agreement
72
06/25/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
73
06/25/2018
Plea Agreement
06/25/2018
Docket Annotation re Non-Compliance with Fed. R. Cr. P. 49.1 (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
06/27/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
07/17/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
07/18/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
78
07/18/2018
Hearing
07/19/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
07/24/2018
Continue
81
07/27/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
08/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
09/12/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
84
09/25/2018
Continue
85
09/25/2018
Affidavit
09/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
09/25/2018
Unopposed Motion
89
09/26/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
90
10/02/2018
Continue
91
10/03/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
92
11/08/2018
Unopposed Motion
93
11/08/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
94
11/26/2018
Continue
95
11/27/2018
Order on Motion to Continue

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.