USA v. Phaymany et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00136-59073 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
107
01/23/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
108
01/30/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
109
01/30/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
110
01/30/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
111
01/30/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
02/06/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
02/08/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
116
02/13/2019
Judgment
117
02/13/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.