USA v. Phillips et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00097-60602 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
69
01/11/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/18/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
72
03/13/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
03/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
04/25/2019
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
83
04/25/2019
Indictment - For Public
04/26/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
04/30/2019
Notice (Other)
04/30/2019
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.