USA v. Phillips et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mj-00436 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/13/2018
Complaint
08/13/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/13/2018
Pretrial Services Report
7
08/13/2018
Pretrial Services Report
08/14/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
08/14/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
10
08/14/2018
Order of Detention
08/14/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
08/14/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
13
08/14/2018
Order of Detention
14
08/14/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
15
08/14/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
16
08/17/2018
Hearing
08/20/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/22/2018
Amended Pretrial Services Report
08/23/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.