USA v. Phillips
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2009-cr-00134 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
41
08/27/2018
Petition for Warrant of Arrest for Offender - 12C
08/27/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned -JDR Retired (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
08/28/2018
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
08/28/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
08/29/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
09/04/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
09/04/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
48
09/04/2018
Order of Detention
51
09/17/2018
Order
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.