USA v. Phoummany
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2007-cr-00021 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/21/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
06/18/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/18/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
109
07/30/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/30/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
114
08/28/2018
Violation Disposition Report
115
08/29/2018
Notice (Other)
08/31/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
117
09/11/2018
Judgment on Revocation
118
09/11/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.