USA v. Pike
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00037 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
50
06/12/2018
Appear
06/12/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
07/10/2018
Appear
07/12/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
07/21/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
57
09/16/2018
Notice (Other)
58
09/18/2018
Continue
09/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
09/27/2018
Appear
62
09/27/2018
Continue
09/28/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
10/05/2018
Plea Agreement
65
10/05/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/05/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.