USA v. Pike
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00037-57299 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
50
06/12/2018
Appear
06/12/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
07/10/2018
Appear
07/12/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
07/21/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
57
09/16/2018
Notice (Other)
58
09/18/2018
Continue
09/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
09/27/2018
Appear
62
09/27/2018
Continue
09/28/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
10/05/2018
Plea Agreement
65
10/05/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/05/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
11/06/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
69
11/21/2018
Continue
11/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/09/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
01/11/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
73
01/11/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
01/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
01/19/2019
Continue
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
78
01/25/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
79
02/05/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
80
02/07/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
81
02/07/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
02/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
02/12/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
02/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/12/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/12/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
02/14/2019
Sentencing
86
02/20/2019
Notice (Other)
02/21/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/21/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.