USA v. Polzel et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00105-58203 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
103
06/26/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
104
07/02/2018
Continue
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
08/20/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
109
09/03/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
117
09/12/2018
Order of Release
09/18/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
122
09/18/2018
Judgment
123
09/18/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
124
09/20/2018
Judgment
125
09/20/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
126
12/27/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
127
12/27/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
128
12/27/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
129
12/28/2018
Order
12/31/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
12/28/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
132
12/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
133
12/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
01/03/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.