USA v. Potzner
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2008-cr-00088-8571 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 118 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/05/2008
INDICTMENT COVER SHEET(S) AND SIGNATURES as to Troy Allen Potzner (1) count(s) 1, 2.
1
Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant Potzner
1 Attachment
2
08/05/2008
INDICTMENT as to Troy Allen Potzner.
3
08/05/2008
NOTICE by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner: investigation/prosecution of case didn't occur while Judge Burgess was U.S. Attorney. Modified on 8/6/2008 to correct file date from 8/6/08 to 8/5/08
4
08/05/2008
NOTICE by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner: investigation/prosecution of case didn't occur while Magistrate Judge Smith was Asst U.S. Attorney or Acting U.S. Attorney.
5
08/11/2008
MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner.
1
writ
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
6
08/12/2008
ORDER Granting 5 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Troy Allen Potzner. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 8/12/2008.
7
08/14/2008
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven M Wells appearing for Troy Allen Potzner
8
08/14/2008
DMS ORDER setting an Arraignment on Indictment as to Troy Allen Potzner for Monday, August 18, 2008, at 11:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. cc: USM, USPO
08/14/2008
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Troy Allen Potzner. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
08/18/2008
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith: Arraignment on Indictment as to Troy Allen Potzner (1) held on 8/18/2008. Defendant pled not guilty to counts 1 and 2 of the Indictment. Pretrial Motions due 9/8/2008; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2008 at 8:30 AM in Anchorage courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess; Trial by Jury set for 10/6/2008 at 9:00 AM in Anchorage courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder AXG.) Government Counsel-Stephan Collins; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Paula McCormick. Defendant Present In Custody. CC: USM, USPO, JC
10
08/18/2008
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Troy Allen Potzner; Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 8/18/2008.CC: USM, USPO
11
08/18/2008
ORDER FOR PROGRESSION OF A CRIMINAL CASE as to Troy Allen Potzner. Motions due by 9/8/2008. Briefs, proposed voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions due by 9/29/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2008 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2008 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 8/18/2008.CC: USM, USPO Modified on 9/3/2008 to correct mots ddln
12
08/25/2008
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/16/08 in case as to Troy Allen Potzner.
13
08/25/2008
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Troy Allen Potzner on 8/16/08.
09/03/2008
Docket Annotation: Error re 11 Order of Progression of a Criminal Case; Incorrect deadline set; Correction: Motions deadline reset from 9/9/08 to 9/8/08. (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
09/08/2008
First MOTION to Suppress by Troy Allen Potzner.
15
09/08/2008
MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Motion to Suppress by Troy Allen Potzner 14 First MOTION to Suppress filed by Troy Allen Potzner
16
09/08/2008
First MOTION to Produce Evidence for Independent Expert Review by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
17
09/09/2008
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Troy Allen Potzner. It is hereby ordered that an Evidentiary Hearing on the Motion to Suppress Evidence filed at Docket 14 is set for 9/19/2008 at 1:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Judge Deborah M. Smith. Given the pending pre-trial conference date of 9/29/08 and trial date of 10/6/08, no extensions of the evidentiary hearing will be granted without a prior extension of the trial date. CC: USM, USPO
18
09/10/2008
First UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Trial by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
19
09/10/2008
First UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Evidentiary Hearing by Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 9/11/2008 to create relationship to document #14
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
20
09/11/2008
TMB ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner GRANTING 18 First UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Trial. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE FPTC previously set for 09/29/08 at 8:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 10/10/2008 at 09:00 AM and the Jury Trial previously set for 10/06/08 at 9:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 10/20/2008 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. It is noted that the new trial date is within the speedy trial deadline. cc: USM, USPO, JC
21
09/11/2008
DMS ORDER Granting 19 Unopposed Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner. It is hereby ordered that the evidentiary hearing currently set for 9/19/08 at 1:30 PM is hereby CONTINUED until 9/24/08 at 1:30 PM CC: USM, USPO
22
09/15/2008
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner re 14 First MOTION to Suppress
23
09/15/2008
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner re 16 First MOTION to Produce Evidence for Independent Expert Review partial non-opposition
24
09/19/2008
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 16 Motion to Produce as to Troy Allen Potzner. The Government is ordered to permit Defendant Potzner, his counsel, and any defense-provided fingerprint examiners to inspect and copy the original fingerprint evidence recovered for this case. This Court denies the motion to the extent it requests the production of the Governments bench and jacket notes related to its fingerprint analysis. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 9/19/2008.
25
09/23/2008
NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING as to Troy Allen Potzner. The Evidentiary Hearing currently set for 9/24/08 at 1:30 PM is CONTINUED until 10/6/08 at 1:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Judge Deborah M. Smith. CC: USM, USPO
26
09/30/2008
Second UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Evidentiary Hearing by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
27
09/30/2008
Second UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Trial by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
28
10/01/2008
TMB ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner GRANTING 27 Second UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Trial. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE Final Pretrial Conference previously set for 10/10/08 at 9:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 10/27/2008 at 08:30 AM The Trial previously set for 10/20/08 at 9:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 11/03/08 at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. This new trial date is within the speedy trial deadline. cc: USM, USPO, JC
29
10/03/2008
DMS ORDER Granting 26 Unopposed Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner. The evidentiary hearing currently set for 1:00 PM on 10/6/08 is VACATED. The Court will issue a separate order setting a new date and time for the hearing. CC: USM, USPO
30
10/06/2008
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Troy Allen Potzner. An Evidentiary Hearing re 14 Defendants First Motion to Suppress is set for 10/14/2008 at 2:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Judge Deborah M. Smith and will continue on 10/15/08 at 10:30 AM until its conclusion. CC: USM, USPO Modified on 10/7/2008 to create relationship to document #14
31
10/13/2008
First MOTION for Hearing Request for Bail Hearing by Troy Allen Potzner.
10/13/2008
Docket Annotation: Error re 31 First MOTION for Hearing Request for Bail Hearing filed by Troy Allen Potzner; No proposed order submitted with motion. Correction: Attorney directed to prepare and file document entitled "Notice of Lodging" with the proposed order submitted as an attachment to the Notice; the Notice is to be linked to the motino at dkt 31. (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/14/2008
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith: Status Conference (Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress (DKT 14)) as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 10/14/2008. Defendant's Oral Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing; GRANTED Court ordered Mr. Wells to file status report re date to set Evidentiary Hearing. Court ordered Mr. Wells to confer with defendant's doctor before filing motion to continue Trial by Jury. (Court Recorder AXG.) Government Counsel-Stephan A. Collins; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Not Present. Defendant Present In Custody. CC: USM, USPO
33
10/15/2008
TMB ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: Due to conflicts in the Court's calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference previously set for 10/27/08 at 8:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 10/31/08 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Trial remains as previously set to begin 11/03/08 at 9:00 AM cc: USM, USPO, JC
34
10/16/2008
NOTICE of Lodging Proposed Order by Troy Allen Potzner re 31 First MOTION for Hearing Request for Bail Hearing
35
10/16/2008
Third UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Trial by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
36
10/16/2008
DMS ORDER Granting 31 Motion for Bail Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner. A Bail Review Hearing is set for 10:00 AM on 10/20/08 in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Judge Deborah M. Smith. CC: USM, USPO
37
10/17/2008
First MOTION to Continue Bail Hearing on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
38
10/17/2008
TMB ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner re 35 Third UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Trial. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Status Conference is set for 10/22/2008 at 02:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 4 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. The Motion to Continue Trial will be addressed. cc: USM, USPO, JC
39
10/17/2008
DMS ORDER Granting 37 Motion to Continue as to Troy Allen Potzner. The Bail Review Hearing set for 10:00 AM on 10/20/08 is hereby CONTINUED until 10:00 AM on 10/23/08. CC: USM, USPO
40
10/21/2008
First MOTION to Continue Status Hearing (unopposed) by Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 10/21/2008 to finalize docket text
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
41
10/21/2008
TMB ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner GRANTING 40 MOTION to Continue Hearing. The Status Conference previously set for 10/22/08 at 2:00 PM is RESET for 10/22/2008 at 10:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 4 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. cc: USM, USPO, JC Modified on 10/21/2008 to create relationship to document #35
42
10/22/2008
Second MOTION to Continue Bail Hearing on Shortened Time, Unopposed by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
43
10/22/2008
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Status Conference as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 10/22/2008. Third UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Trial 35 filed by Troy Allen Potzner; GRANTED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2008 at 11:00 AM and Trial by Jury set for 11/03/2008 at 9:00 AM; VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2008 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Jury Trial set for 12/1/2008 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder SAL.) Government Counsel-Stephan A. Collins; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Not Present. Defendant Present In Custody. CC: USM, USPO, JC.
44
10/22/2008
DMS ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Continue Bail Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner. The Bail Review Hearing previously set for 10:00 AM on 10/23/08 is CONTINUED until 10:00 AM on 10/31/08. CC: USM, USPO
45
10/22/2008
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Troy Allen Potzner - An Evidentiary Hearing re Defendants Motion to Suppress 14 is set for 11/13/2008 at 02:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Judge Deborah M. Smith and will continue at 9:30 AM on 11/14/2008 until its conclusion. CC: USM, USPO
46
10/30/2008
First MOTION to Vacate Bail Hearing on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
47
10/30/2008
DMS ORDER Granting 46 Motion to Vacate as to Troy Allen Potzner. The Bail Review Hearing set for 10:00 AM on 10/31/08 IS HEREBY VACATED. CC: USM, USPO
48
11/06/2008
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Non-Resident Attorney: David A. Elden. by Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 11/6/2008 to reflect error: Motion is not incompliance with with LR 83.1; motion terminated; Correction: Attorney to refile motion in accordance with LR 83.1. Modified on 11/14/2008 to reflect motion re-instated on 11/6/08 when $150.00 filing fee received.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
49
11/06/2008
Second UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Evidentiary Hearing by Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 11/12/2008 to create relationship to dkt 14.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
50
11/06/2008
Fourth UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Trial by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
51
11/06/2008
Receipt of 150.00 non-resident attorney payment for Steven M. Wells as to Troy Allen Potzner.
52
11/07/2008
TMB ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Hearing on the Fourth Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial at Docket 50 is set for 11/10/2008 at 03:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Mr. Elden may participate telephonically by calling the Meet-Me-Bridge at (907) 677-6247. cc: USM, USPO, JC
53
11/10/2008
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Motion Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 11/10/2008 re 50 Fourth UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Trial filed by Troy Allen Potzner; GRANTED. Court found excludable delay under 18 U.S.C. SECTION (h)(8)(A)(B) Continuance Granted; (h)(8)(B)(iv); Reasonable time to prepared. Final Pretrial Conference previously set for 12/01/2008 at 8:30 AM and Trial by Jury previously set for 12/01/2008 at 9:00 AM VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2009 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Trial by Jury set for 2/9/2009 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder SAL.) Government Counsel-Frank Russo; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells and David Elden; Defendant Present In Custody. CC: USM, USPO, JC.
54
11/12/2008
DMS ORDER Granting 49 Unopposed Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner. The Evidentiary Hearing set for 11/13/08 is hereby CONTINUED until 1/8/09 at 9:30 AM CC: USM, USPO
55
11/25/2008
AFFIDAVIT of David A. Elden by Troy Allen Potzner 48 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Non-Resident Attorney: David A. Elden. filed by Troy Allen Potzner
1
Supplement Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
56
11/26/2008
DMS ORDER Granting 48 Motion for Leave to Appear as to Troy Allen Potzner. Mr. David Elden is hereby authorized to appear as co-counsel for Defendant Potzner in this case. He is to be served electronically on any documents filed in this matter.
57
12/31/2008
MOTION to Continue Trial, Unopposed and on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
58
12/31/2008
TMB ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: A hearing on the 57 MOTION to Continue Trial is hereby scheduled to commence on Tuesday, January 6, 2009, at 10:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Defense co-counsel, David Elden, may appear telephonic by calling this court's case management clerk, Pam Richter, at (907) 677-6125 no later than 24 hours in advance of the hearing for instructions on how to proceed. cc: USM, USPO
59
01/02/2009
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Andrea T. Steward appearing for USA.
60
01/06/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial 57 as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 1/6/2009. Defendant's MOTION to Continue Trial, Unopposed and on Shortened Time;GRANTED. Final Pretrial Conference previously set for 02/09/2009 at 8:30 AM and Trial by Jury previously set for 02/09/2009 at 9:00 AM VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2009 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Jury Trial set for 3/23/2009 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder SAL.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells and David A. Elden; USPO/PTS Officer-Not Present. Defendant Present In Custody. CC: USM, USPO, JC.
61
01/07/2009
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Troy Allen Potzner. A status conference regarding the Evidentiary Hearing on the Motion to Suppress (DKT 14) is set for 1/13/09 at 9:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Judge Deborah M. Smith. Co-counsel Mr. Elden may appear telephonically by calling 907-677-6230. CC: USM, USPO
62
01/07/2009
DMS ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: the Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/8/09 at 9:30 AM is hereby VACATED. CC: USM, USPO
63
01/07/2009
TMB ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Scheduling Conference is set for 1/9/2009 at 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Defense Co-Counsel David Elden may appear telephonic by calling the case management clerk at (907) 677-6125 for instructions. The parties are directed to confer prior to the hearing and discuss trial dates and be prepared to confirm a trial date in late March, 2009. cc: USM, USPO, JC
01/08/2009
Docket Annotation as to Troy Allen Potzner: On January 5, 2009 the CMECF Help Desk contacted attorney Elden and directed him to add his email address to his CM/ECF account so that he would be receiving notices electornically in accordance with the order at docket 56. Upon review of attorney Elden's CM/ECF account this morning,it was determined that attorney Elden had still not added his email address. In order to assist with service in this case, the CM/ECF Help Desk added the following email address to attorney Elden's CM/ECF attorney account: elden@innocent.com (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
01/09/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess: Scheduling Conference as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 1/9/2009. Trial by Jury previously set for 3/23/09 at 8:30 AM is VACATED and reset for 4/13/2009 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Final Pretrial Conference previously set for 2/27/09 at 8:30 AM is VACATED and reset for 4/13/2009 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Court found excludable delay under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(8)(A)(B). (Court Recorder AMK.) Government Counsel-Thomas Bradley; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells and David Elden (telephonic); Defendant Present In Custody. cc: JC, USM, USPO.
66
01/12/2009
DMS ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: the Status Conference previously set for 1/13/09 at 9:30 AM is hereby VACATED and an Evidentiary Hearing on the Motion to Suppress (DKT 14) is SET for 2/17/09 at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Judge Deborah M. Smith. The hearing will continue on 2/18/09 at 9:00 AM, if necessary. CC: USM, USPO Modified on 1/12/2009 TO create relationship to dkt 14.
68
01/30/2009
First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest Warrant by Troy Allen Potzner.
69
01/30/2009
MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Motion to Suppress by Troy Allen Potzner 68 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest Warrant filed by Troy Allen Potzner
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
2
Exhibit Exhibit B
3
Exhibit Exhibit C
4
Exhibit Exhibit D
5
Exhibit Exhibit E
6
Exhibit Exhibit F
6 Attachments
70
01/30/2009
Amended MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Warrantless Search by Troy Allen Potzner.
71
01/30/2009
MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Motion to Suppress by Troy Allen Potzner 70 Amended MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Warrantless Search filed by Troy Allen Potzner
1
Exhibit Declaration of Jacquelyn Deakins
1 Attachment
72
01/30/2009
First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Search Warrant by Troy Allen Potzner.
73
01/30/2009
MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Motion to Suppress by Troy Allen Potzner 72 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Search Warrant filed by Troy Allen Potzner
1
Exhibit Exhibit G
2
Exhibit Exhibit H
3
Exhibit Exhibit I
4
Exhibit Exhibit J
4 Attachments
74
02/03/2009
MINUTE ORDER FROM CHAMBERS as to Troy Allen Potzner re Pretrial Motions. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 2/3/2009.
75
02/04/2009
First UNOPPOSED MOTION To Allow Late-Filed Motions by Troy Allen Potzner.
76
02/04/2009
AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Wells by Troy Allen Potzner 75 First UNOPPOSED MOTION To Allow Late-Filed Motions filed by Troy Allen Potzner
77
02/04/2009
DMS ORDER Granting 75 Unopposed Motion to Allow Late-Filed Motions as to Troy Allen Potzner. It is hereby ordered that Defendant's pretrial motions are accepted for filing.
78
02/05/2009
DMS ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: The order at docket 74 inadvertently stated that the evidentiary hearing on the pending Motions to Suppress Evidence at dockets 14, 68, 70 and 72 is set February 18 and 19, 2009. The parties are advised that the evidentiary hearing remains set February 17 and 18, 2009, at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. cc: USM, USPO
79
02/06/2009
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Defense Motions to Suppress, Filed on Shortened Time by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 2/6/2009 to create relationship to dkts 68, 70 and 72.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
80
02/06/2009
DMS ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: Having considered the Governments Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Defense Motions to Suppress, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Governments motion is GRANTED. The Governments responses are due by NOON on February 13, 2009. Modified on 2/10/2009 to create relationship to document #68, #70 and #72
81
02/13/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner re 68 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest Warrant, 72 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Search Warrant, 70 Amended MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Warrantless Search
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
14 Attachments
82
02/16/2009
NOTICE in Support of Defendant's Motion to Suppress by Troy Allen Potzner re 72 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Search Warrant, 68 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest Warrant, 71 Memorandum, 69 Memorandum, 70 Amended MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Warrantless Search, 73 Memorandum
1
Exhibit Declaration of Troy Potzner
1 Attachment
83
02/16/2009
Second MOTION to Produce by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
84
02/16/2009
First MOTION To Allow Reply Brief re 81 Response in Opposition, by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
85
02/16/2009
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Troy Allen Potzner re 84 First MOTION To Allow Reply Brief re 81 Response in Opposition, Modified on 2/18/2009 to create relationships to dkts 22, 68, 70, 72.
86
02/17/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith: Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress (DKT 14), Motion to Quash & Traverse Arrest Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 68), Amended Motion to Suppress Evidence From Warrantless Search (DKT 70), and Motion to Quash & Traverse Search Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 72) as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 2/17/2009. Defendant's Motion to Allow Reply Brief (Dkt 84) GRANTED. Defendant's Motion to Produce (Dkt 83) held in ABEYANCE. Stipulation stated. Witness exclusionary rule invoked. Witness sworn. Exhibits admitted. Continued Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress (DKT 14), Motion to Quash & Traverse Arrest Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 68), Amended Motion to Suppress Evidence From Warrantless Search (DKT 70), and Motion to Quash & Traverse Search Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 72) set for 2/18/2009 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. Court ordered clerk to order an expedited transcript of the proceeding. (Court Recorder AMK.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells and David Elden; Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO. Modified on 2/19/2009 to create relationship to document #83
87
02/18/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith: Continued Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress (Dkt 14), Motion to Quash & Traverse Arrest Warrant & to Suppress Ev8idence (Dkt 68), Amended Motion to Suppress Evidence From Warrantless Search (Dkt 70), and Motion to Quash & Traverse Search Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (Dkt 72) as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 2/18/2009. Witnesses sworn. Exhibits admitted. Continued Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress (Dkt 14), Motion to Quash & Traverse Arrest Warrant & to Suppress Ev8idence (Dkt 68), Amended Motion to Suppress Evidence From Warrantless Search (Dkt 70), and Motion to Quash & Traverse Search Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (Dkt 72) for 2/25/2009 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. OFF RECORD NOTE: Court ordered clerk to order an expedited transcript of the proceeding. (Court Recorder AMK.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells and David Elden; Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO.
88
02/19/2009
ORDER FROM CHAMBERS regarding Evidentiary Hearing Exhibits.
89
02/20/2009
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Troy Allen Potzner; Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress (DKT 14), Motion to Quash & Traverse Arrest Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 68), Amend Motion to SuppressEvidence from Warrantless Search (DKT 70), and Motion to Quash & Traverse Search Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 72) held on 2/17/2009 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Court Recorder: AMK. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the transcriber, T.M. Transcribing by calling 907-277-8591. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Additional deadlines regarding this transcript are: Redaction Request due 3/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2009.
90
02/25/2009
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Troy Allen Potzner; Continued Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress (DKT 14), Motion to Quash & Travers Arrest Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 68), Amended Motion to Suppress Evidence from Warrantless Search (DKT 70), and Motion to Quash & Travers Search Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 72). held on 2/18/2009 before Judge Deborah M. Smith. Court Recorder: AMK/SAL. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the transcriber, T. M. Transcribing by calling 907-277-8591. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Additional deadlines regarding this transcript are: Redaction Request due 3/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/31/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009.
91
02/25/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith: Continued Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress (DKT 14), Motion to Quash & Traverse Arrest Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 68), Amended Motion to Suppress Evidence From Warrantless Search (DKT 70), and Motion to Quash & Traverse Search Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 72) as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 2/25/2009. Witnesses sworn. Exhibits admitted. Defendant's Motion to Produce (Dkt 83) DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant's Motions to Suppress at Dockets 14, 68, 70, and 72 taken UNDER ADVISEMENT, written ruling to issue. Court ordered clerk to order an expedited transcript of the proceeding. (Court Recorder AMK.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells and David Elden; Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO.
92
02/25/2009
WITNESS LIST re Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress (DKT 14), Motion to Quash & Traverse Arrest Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 68), Amended Motion to Suppress Evidence From Warrantless Search (DKT 70), and Motion to Quash & Traverse Search Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 72) held on 2/17/09 thru 2/25/09 as to Troy Allen Potzner.
93
02/25/2009
EXHIBIT LIST re Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress (DKT 14), Motion to Quash & Traverse Arrest Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 68), Amended Motion to Suppress Evidence From Warrantless Search (DKT 70), and Motion to Quash & Traverse Search Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 72) held on 2/17/09 thru 2/25/09 as to Troy Allen Potzner.
94
03/03/2009
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Troy Allen Potzner; Continued Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress (DKT 14), Motion to Quash & Travers Arrest Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 68), Amended Motion to Suppress Evidence from Warrantless Search (DKT 70), and Motion to Quash & Travers Search Warrant & to Suppress Evidence (DKT 72) held on 2/25/2009 before Judge Deborah M. Smith. Court Recorder: AMK. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the transcriber, T.M. Transcribing by calling 907-277-8591. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Additional deadlines regarding this transcript are: Redaction Request due 3/24/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2009.
95
03/05/2009
FIRST SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT COVER SHEET(S) AND SIGNATURES as to Troy Allen Potzner (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s.
1
Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant Potzner
1 Attachment
96
03/05/2009
FIRST SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 3/6/2009 to add "first superseding" to text
97
03/06/2009
DMS ORDER setting an Arraignment on the Superseding Indictment 96 as to Troy Allen Potzner on Monday, March 9, 2009 at 2:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. cc: USM, USPO
98
03/09/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith: Arraignment on First Superseding Indictment as to Troy Allen Potzner (1) held on 3/9/2009. Defendant pled not guilty to counts 1s-3s. (Court Recorder DJE.) Government Counsel-Frnak Russo; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Paula McCormick. Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO.
99
03/10/2009
First MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Allow Supplemental Argment by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
2
Exhibit A
2 Attachments
101
03/16/2009
Sixth MOTION to Continue Trial by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
102
03/16/2009
TMB ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner re 101 Sixth MOTION to Continue Trial. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Response shall be due by 5:00 PM on 3/20/2009. A Hearing on the Motion to Continue Trial is set for 3/24/2009 at 11:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. cc: USM, USPO, JC
103
03/17/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner re 99 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Allow Supplemental Argment
104
03/17/2009
DMS ORDER Granting 99 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Argument as to Troy Allen Potzner. Defendants proposed supplemental argument may be filed and the Governments proposed supplemental argument contained in its Response in Opposition to Supplemental Arugement 103 may be filed. No further supplemental arguments from either side will be accepted.
105
03/20/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner re 101 Sixth MOTION to Continue Trial
106
03/24/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Motion Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 3/24/2009 re 101 Sixth MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Troy Allen Potzner; GRANTED. Court found excludable delay under 18 U.S.C SECTION (h)(8)(A)(B); Continuance granted; 18 U.S.C. (h)(8)(B)(i); Miscarriage of Justice. Final Pretrial Conference previously set for 04/13/2009 at 8:30 AM and Trial by Jury previously set for 04/13/2009 at 9:00 AM VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2009 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2009 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Briefs, proposed voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions due by 6/16/2009.(Court Recorder SAL.) Government Counsel-Joe Bottini; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells and David Elden - Telephonic; Defendant Present In Custody.CC: USM, USPO, JC.
108
03/25/2009
AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY: The parties are advised that PDF DOCUMENT is amended as follows: Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Motion Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 3/24/2009 re 101 Sixth MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Troy Allen Potzner; GRANTED. Court found excludable delay under *18 U.S.C SECTION (h)(7)(A)(B); Continuance granted; *18 U.S.C. (h)(7)(B)(i); Miscarriage of Justice. Final Pretrial Conference previously set for 04/13/2009 at 8:30 AM and Trial by Jury previously set for 04/13/2009 at 9:00 AM VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2009 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2009 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Briefs, proposed voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions due by 6/16/2009.(Court Recorder SAL.) Government Counsel-Joe Bottini; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells and David Elden - Telephonic; Defendant Present In Custody.CC: USM, USPO, JC
109
03/25/2009
SECOND AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY: The parties are advised that the PDF DOCUMENT is amended as follows: Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Motion Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 3/24/2009 re 101 Sixth MOTION to Continue Trial f iled by Troy Allen Potzner; GRANTED. Court found excludable delay under *18 U.S.C SECTION 3161 (h)(7)(A)(B); Continuance granted; *18 U.S.C. 3161 (h)(7)(B)(i); Miscarriage of Justice. Final Pretrial Conference previously set for 04/13/2009 at 8:30 AM and Tri al by Jury previously set for 04/13/2009 at 9:00 AM VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2009 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2009 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. B urgess. Briefs, proposed voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions due by 6/16/2009.(Court Recorder SAL.) Government Counsel-Joe Bottini; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells and David Elden - Telephonic; Defendant Present In Custody.CC: USM, USP O, JC
113
04/22/2009
NOTICE of Recent United States Sumpreme Court Decision by Troy Allen Potzner
114
05/28/2009
NOTICE of rebuttal by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner re 113 Notice (Other)
115
06/02/2009
Seventh UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Trial by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
116
06/03/2009
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner re 115 Seventh UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue Trial. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT a hearing on the Motion to Continue Trial is set for 6/22/2009 at 01:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Mr. Elden may appear telephonically by making arrangements with the case manager at (907) 677-6125 at least 24 hours in advance. cc: USM, USPO, JC
117
06/09/2009
INITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Troy Allen Potzner re 68 First Motion to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest Warrant recommending the motion be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 6/30/2009; Reply to Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2009. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 6/9/2009.
118
06/22/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Motion Hearing re 115 Seventh UNOPPOSED MOTION To Continue held on 6/22/2009. Defendant's Seventh Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial GRANTED. Court found excludable delay under 18 USC Section 3161(h)(7)(B)(ii); case unusual or complex. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2009 08:30 AM is VACATED and reset for 12/14/2009 08:30 AM and Jury Trial set for 6/23/2009 09:00 AM is VACATED and reset for 12/14/2009 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder SCD.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells and David Elden (Telephonic); Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO, JC
119
06/30/2009
First UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Opposition Deadline by Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 6/30/2009 to create relationship to dkt 68.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
120
06/30/2009
First MOTION for Leave to File Over-Sized Brief Filed on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 7/8/2009 to create relationship to document #68
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
121
06/30/2009
ERRATA by Troy Allen Potzner 120 First MOTION for Leave to File Over-Sized Brief Filed on Shortened Time filed by Troy Allen Potzner Modified on 7/8/2009 to create relationship to document #68
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
122
06/30/2009
DMS ORDER Granting 119 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline as to Troy Allen Potzner. The deadline for filing objections to the Initial Report & Recommendation [Doc. 117] is hereby extended until July 10, 2009. Modified on 7/1/2009 to create relationship to document #68
123
06/30/2009
DMS ORDER re 120 Motion to Allow Oversized Opposition filed on Shortened Time: After due consideration of Defendants Motion to Allow Oversized Opposition filed on shortened time, the Court GRANTS the motion IN PART. Defendant is allowed to file an over length objection to the Initial Report and Recommendation, not to exceed 15 pages. In support of its position, Defendant cited Ak.L.R. 10.1(m), which allows a principal brief of up to 25 pages. This rule does not apply to objections to reports and recommendations because objections are not principal briefs or memoranda. Modified on 7/8/2009 to create relationship to document #68
124
07/10/2009
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 68 by Troy Allen Potzner Modified on 7/10/2009 to create relationship to document #68 and remove relationship to document #117
125
07/10/2009
MEMORANDUM by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner 117 INITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Troy Allen Potzner re 68 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest WarrantINITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Troy Allen Potzner re 68 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest Warrant Modified on 7/10/2009 to create relationship to document #68
126
07/13/2009
DMS ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: The Government's Response to the objections (docket 124) to the 117 Initial Report and Recommendation as to the 68 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest Warrant are due on or before the close of business on July 20, 2009.
127
07/20/2009
MEMORANDUM Reply to Defendant's Objections to the Report and Recommendation by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner 124 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Troy Allen Potzner, 117 INITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Troy Allen Potzner re 68 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest WarrantINITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Troy Allen Potzner re 68 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest Warrant Modified on 7/21/2009 to reflect error and remove relationship to documents #117 and #124: see 7/21/09 Docket Annotation below.
07/21/2009
Docket Annotation: Error: Wrong event selected re 127 ; Correction: Attorney to refile the document using the event "Reply to Objection to Report and Recommendation" and link to the "Motion to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest Warrant at dkt #68. Modified on 7/21/2009 to create relationship to document #68 (Text entry; no document attached.)
128
07/21/2009
REPLY TO OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 117 by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner Modified on 7/22/2009 to create relationship to document #68 and remove relationship to document #117
129
07/23/2009
First MOTION for Hearing for Detention Review by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
130
07/23/2009
MEMORANDUM by Troy Allen Potzner 129 First MOTION for Hearing for Detention Review filed by Troy Allen Potzner
131
07/27/2009
DMS ORDER Granting 129 Motion for Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner. It is hereby ordered that a Bail Review Hearing is SET for 10:00 AM on 8/10/2009 in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Judge Deborah M. Smith. CC: USM, USPO
132
08/07/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner re 129 First MOTION for Hearing for Detention Review
133
08/10/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith:Bail Review Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 8/10/2009. Defendants Oral Motion to Release the Defendant Under Conditions Set by the Court; DENIED. (Court Recorder AXG.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells and David A. Elden; USPO/PTS Officer-Karen Brewer. Defendant Present In Custody. CC: USM, USPO
136
10/28/2009
First MOTION Request for Ruling re 70 Amended MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Warrantless Search by Troy Allen Potzner.
137
11/16/2009
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Troy Allen Potzner re 68 First Motion to Suppress Evidence from Service of Arrest Warrant recommending the motion be DENIED. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 11/16/2009.
138
11/16/2009
INITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Troy Allen Potzner re 14 First Motion to Suppress and 70 Amended Motion to Suppress Evidence from Warrantless Search recommending the motion be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 11/30/2009; Reply to Objections to R&R due by 12/7/2009. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 11/16/2009. Modified on 11/17/2009 to remove relationship to document #14 Modified on 11/17/2009 to create relationship to document #14; removed in error.
139
11/17/2009
INITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Troy Allen Potzner re 72 First Motion to Suppress Evidence from Search Warrant recommending the motion be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 12/1/2009; Reply to Objections to R&R due by 12/8/2009. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 11/17/2009. Modified on 11/17/2009 to remove relationship to document #72 Modified on 11/17/2009 to create relationship to document #72; removed in error.
140
11/19/2009
MOTION for Hearing Regarding Trial Date filed Unopposed and Filed on Shortened Time by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
141
11/19/2009
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner GRANTING 140 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing Regarding Trial Date. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Status Conference is set for 11/24/2009 at 10:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Parties who wish to appear telephonically may contact the Case Management Clerk at (907) 677-6125 prior to the hearing. cc: USM, USPO
142
11/24/2009
MOTION Reopen Evidentiary Hearing FILED ON SHORTENED TIME by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 11/24/2009 to create relationship to documents #14, #70 and #72
1
Affidavit of Deputy US Marshal Troy Meeks
2
Affidavit of AUSA Andrea Steward
3
Affidavit of Chief Deputy US Marshal Marc Otte
4
Proposed Order
4 Attachments
143
11/24/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Status Conference as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 11/24/2009. 142 MOTION Reopen Evidentiary Hearing FILED ON SHORTENED TIME DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Court ordered parties to file objections to Initial R&R (Dkt 138) by 12/9/2009 and reply to objections by 12/21/2009. Defendant's oral motion to continue trial GRANTED. Court found excludable delay under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7)(B)(i); Failure to continue would stop further proceedings or result in miscarriage of justice. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2009 08:30 AM is VACATED and reset for 3/15/2010 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2009 09:00 AM is VACATED and reset for 3/15/2010 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Court ordered Mr. Wells to contact the BOP re Defendant's medical treatment and to file a notice with the court. (Court Recorder SCD.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-David A. Elden (Telephonic) and Steven M. Wells; Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO Modified on 12/10/2009 to create relationships to documents #14, #70 and #138
144
11/30/2009
ORDER re Motion to Reopen Evidentiary Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/24/09.
145
12/04/2009
MOTION Reopen Evidentiary Hearing (RENEWED) by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 12/8/2009 to create relationship to documents #14, #70 and #138
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
146
12/04/2009
AFFIDAVIT of US Marshal Troy Meeks by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner 145 MOTION Reopen Evidentiary Hearing (RENEWED) filed by USA
147
12/04/2009
AFFIDAVIT of AUSA Andrea T. Steward by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner 145 MOTION Reopen Evidentiary Hearing (RENEWED) filed by USA
148
12/04/2009
AFFIDAVIT of Chief Deputy US Marshal Marc Otte by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner 145 MOTION Reopen Evidentiary Hearing (RENEWED) filed by USA
149
12/09/2009
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Magistrate's Initial Report and Recommendations, Unopposed and on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time
1 Attachment
150
12/09/2009
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Allow Oversized Opposition to Magistrate's Initial Report and Recommendations on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order Allowing Oversized Opposition to Magistrate's Initial Report and Recommendations
1 Attachment
151
12/10/2009
DMS ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: After due consideration of Defendant's Motion to Allow Oversized Opposition filed on Shortened Time 150, the Court GRANTS the motion. Defendant is allowed to file overlength objections to the Initial Reports and Recommendations at Docket Nos. 138 and 139; the objections should not exceed 15 pages. Modified on 12/10/2009 to create relationships to dkts #14, #70 and #72.
152
12/10/2009
DMS ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner re 149 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Document: Defendant having moved to allow to extend the deadline to file objections to the Initial Reports and Recommendations at Docket Nos. 138 and 139, and there being no opposition from the government, the motion is hereby granted. The deadline for filing objections to the Reports and Recommendations is hereby extended until December 18, 2009. Modified on 12/10/2009 to create relationships to dkts #14, #70 and #72.
153
12/10/2009
MOTION to Allow Oversized Opposition FILED ON SHORTENED TIME by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 12/10/2009 to create relationship to dkts 14, 70, 72.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
154
12/14/2009
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Re-Open Evidentiary Hearing (Unopposed & on shortened time) by Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 12/15/2009 to add reference to shortened time & to create relationship to document #145
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
155
12/15/2009
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner GRANTING 154 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to 145 MOTION Reopen Evidentiary Hearing. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall have until 12/18/2009 to file a Response.
156
12/15/2009
DMS ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner Granting 153 Motion To Allow Oversized Opposition. The Government is allowed to file oversized objections to the Initial Reports and Recommendations at Docket Nos. 138 and 139; the objections should not exceed 20 pages. Modified on 12/16/2009 to create relationships to documents #14, #70 and #72
157
12/18/2009
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 139 INITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Troy Allen Potzner re 72 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Search WarrantINITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Troy Allen Potzner re 72 First MOTION to Suppress Evidence from Search Warrant On Shortened Time and Unopposed by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order to extend reply to initial report and recommendaiton
1 Attachment
158
12/18/2009
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Mtn to Re-Open Evidentiary Hearing on Shortened Time and Unopposed by Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 12/21/2009 to create relationship to document #145
1
Proposed Order to Ext Deadline to File Opp to ReOpen Evid Hrg
1 Attachment
159
12/18/2009
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 158 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to governments renewed motion to Reopen Evidentiary Hearing at Docket 145. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendant's Response is due 01/04/10. Modified on 12/21/2009 to create relationship to document #145
160
12/21/2009
DMS ORDER Granting 157 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Troy Allen Potzner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Reply and Objections to the Initial Reports and Recommendations at Dockets 138 and 139 are due Janaury 04, 2010. Modified on 12/21/2009 to create relationships to documents #14, #70 and #72.
161
12/21/2009
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File OBJECTIONS FILED ON SHORTENED TIME by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 12/21/2009 to reflect "unopposed."
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
162
12/22/2009
DMS ORDER Granting 161 Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Troy Allen Potzner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Government's Objections to the Initial Reports and Recommendations at Dockets 138 and 139 are due Janaury 04, 2010.
163
01/04/2010
NOTICE OF INTENT TO CHANGE PLEA as to Troy Allen Potzner
164
01/05/2010
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner re 163 Notice of Intent to Change Plea. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Change of Plea Hearing is set for 1/7/2010 at 02:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. cc: USM, USPO
165
01/06/2010
FELONY INFORMATION as to Troy Allen Potzner (1) count(s) 1ss.
1
Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant Potzner
1 Attachment
166
01/06/2010
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Troy Allen Potzner
167
01/06/2010
SEALED PLEA AGREEMENT ADDENDUM as to Troy Allen Potzner
168
01/06/2010
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: The Thursday, January 7, 2010, proposed change of plea hearing set to commence at 2:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess is re-scheduled as an Arraignment and Entry of Plea as to the 165 Felony Information. cc: USM, USPO
169
01/07/2010
DMS ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner; A Bail Review Hearing set for 1/7/2010 03:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Deborah M. Smith. cc: USM, USPO
170
01/07/2010
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Arraignment and Entry of Plea Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner (1) Count 1ss held on 1/7/2010. Plea entered by Troy Allen Potzner (1) Guilty Count 1ss. Sentencing set for 4/16/2010 11:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial by Jury VACATED. NOTICE: No less than seven (7) days prior to the sentencing date, each party shall file a written sentencing memo pursuant to D.AK 32.1(d) and serve opposing counsel and the probation officer.(Court Recorder SCD.) Government Counsel-Frank Russo; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells and David A. Elden; USPO/PTS Officer-Scott Waters. Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO, JC
171
01/07/2010
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Troy Allen Potzner
172
01/07/2010
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith: Bail Review Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 1/7/2010. Defendant's oral Motion for Release With Conditions GRANTED. (Court Recorder DJE.) Government Counsel-Frank Russo; Defense Counsel-David Elden, Steven Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Paula McCormick, Scott Waters. Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO.
173
01/07/2010
Appearance Bond set as to Troy Allen Potzner in amount of $ 20,000.00 Unsecured. cc: USM, USPO, Finance. Modified on 1/8/2010 to add "Finance" to distribution
174
01/07/2010
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 1/7/10. cc: USM, USPO.
175
01/07/2010
Bail Information Sheet re 174 Order Setting Conditions of Release, 173 Appearance Bond by Troy Allen Potzner. cc: USM, USPO, Finance. Modified on 1/8/2010 to add "Finance" to distribution
176
01/07/2010
ORDER of Release. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 1/7/10. cc: orig plus 1 cy to USM, USPO.
180
02/02/2010
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Troy Allen Potzner; Arraignment on Felony Information and Entry of Plea held on 01/7/2010 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Court Recorder: SCD. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the transcriber, T. M. Transcribing by calling 907-277-5494. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Additional deadlines regarding this transcript are: Redaction Request due 2/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2010.
181
03/30/2010
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Sentencing Filed on Shortened Time by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner. Modified on 3/30/2010 to add "unopposed" to text
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
182
03/30/2010
DECLARATION of Andrea T. Steward by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner 181 MOTION to Continue Sentencing Filed on Shortened Time filed by USA
183
03/31/2010
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 181 Unopposed Motion to Continue IOS as to Troy Allen Potzner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the IOS previously set for 04/16/10 11:00 AM is VACATED AND RESET for 04/09/10 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Sentencing memoranda are now due 04/02/10.
184
03/31/2010
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the IOS previously set for 04/09/10 at 9:00 AM is VACATED AND RESET for 6/18/2010 at 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Sentencing Memos due by 6/11/2010. cc: USM, USPO Modified on 3/31/2010 to add "USM, USPO" to distribution
185
05/10/2010
First UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
186
05/11/2010
ORDER GRANTING 185 Unopposed Motion to Continue IOS as to Troy Allen Potzner (1). IOS previously set for 06/18/10 at 9:00 AM is VACATED AND RESET FOR 07/22/10 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. cc: USM, USPO
187
07/08/2010
PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Sealed) as to Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Presentence Report
1 Attachment
188
07/15/2010
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Sentencing Filed on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Exhibit Letter from Dr. Mills
2
Exhibit Letter from Dr. Rothoff
3
Proposed Order
3 Attachments
189
07/15/2010
AFFIDAVIT of Steven Wells by Troy Allen Potzner 188 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Sentencing Filed on Shortened Time filed by Troy Allen Potzner
190
07/16/2010
ORDER GRANTING 188 Unopposed Motion to Continue IOS as to Troy Allen Potzner. The IOS previously set for 07/22/10 at 2:00 is VACATED. A Status hearing to set a new IOS is set for 08/23/10 at 11:00 AM Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 07/16/10. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
191
08/23/2010
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess: Status Conference as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 8/23/2010. Sentencing Memoranda due 10/15/2010. Imposition of Sentence set for 11/1/2010 at 3:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder DJE.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Karen Brewer. Defendant Present On Bond. cc: USM, USPO.
192
09/21/2010
First MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release Unopposed by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
193
09/24/2010
ORDER GRANTING 192 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Troy Allen Potzner (1). Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 09/24/10. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
194
09/28/2010
NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven M. Wells
195
10/01/2010
Second MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release Filed on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Exhibit Letter from Physician's Office
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
196
10/01/2010
AFFIDAVIT of Counsel In Support of Filing on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner 195 Second MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release Filed on Shortened Time filed by Troy Allen Potzner
197
10/15/2010
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner
198
10/15/2010
SEALED SENTENCING MEMORANDUM SUPPLEMENT as to Troy Allen Potzner
199
10/18/2010
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Troy Allen Potzner
1
Exhibit Medical Records
2
Exhibit Medical Records
3
Exhibit Medical Records
4
Exhibit Medical Records
5
Exhibit Medical Records
5 Attachments
200
10/18/2010
SEALED SENTENCING MEMORANDUM SUPPLEMENT as to Troy Allen Potzner
201
10/18/2010
First MOTION for Leave to File Late Sentencing Memo, Unopposed by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
202
10/19/2010
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 201 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File IOS Memo Late as to Troy Allen Potzner (1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the IOS Memorandum filed at Docket 199 is accepted as filed. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
203
11/01/2010
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess: Status Conference (Imposition of Sentence) as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 11/1/2010. Imposition of Sentence set for 11/30/2010 at 1:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Defendants oral Motion to Unseal the Order at Docket 262 in U.S.A. v. Harvey, 3:07-cr-00103-RRB, taken UNDER ADVISEMENT. Supplemental sentencing memoranda, if any, due 11/22/2010 and may be filed under seal at the filing partys discretion. (Court Recorder DJE.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-David Elden and Steve Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Karen Brewer. Defendant Present On Bond. cc: USM, USPO.
204
11/01/2010
NOTICE Notice to Discontinue Electronic Service by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner
206
11/05/2010
ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner re 203 hearing. Defendant's Oral Motion to Unseal order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/4/10. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
207
11/15/2010
DMS ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: The Court will hold a Bail Review Hearing at 10:30 AM on November 16, 2010 in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Judge Deborah M. Smith. CC: USM, USPO (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF)
208
11/16/2010
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah M. Smith:Bond Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 11/16/2010. Defendant's oral motion to modify defendant's conditions of release DENIED. Court found defendant in violation of his conditions of release; Defendant REMANDED. (Court Recorder SCD.) Government Counsel-Frank Russo; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Paula McCormick. Defendant Present Released on Bond. cc: USM, USPO
209
11/16/2010
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Troy Allen Potzner Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 11/16/10. cc: USM, USPO
210
11/17/2010
SUPPLEMENT to Government's Sentencing Memorandum by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner 197 Sentencing Memorandum filed by USA
211
11/23/2010
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner IOS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the IOS previously set for 11/30/2010 at 1:00 PM is RESET FOR 11/30/10 at 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
212
11/23/2010
REVISED PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Sealed) as to Troy Allen Potzner. Replaces presentence investigation report filed at docket 187.
1
Revised Presentence Report
1 Attachment
213
11/24/2010
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Sentencing Filed on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
214
11/24/2010
AFFIDAVIT of Steven Wells by Troy Allen Potzner 213 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Sentencing Filed on Shortened Time filed by Troy Allen Potzner
215
11/29/2010
ORDER granting 213 Unopposed Motion as to Troy Allen Potzner (1); IOS set for 11/30/10 is VACATED, time will be used to set a sentencing date. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/29/10. cc: USM, USPO
216
11/30/2010
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic Filed on Shortened Time Attorney: David Elden. by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
217
11/30/2010
AFFIDAVIT of Steven Wells by Troy Allen Potzner 216 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic Filed on Shortened Time Attorney: David Elden. filed by Troy Allen Potzner
218
11/30/2010
TMB ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner (1); granting 216 Motion for Leave to Appear telephonically at the Status Hearing set for 11/30/10 at 9:00 AM.
219
11/30/2010
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Scheduling Conference as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 11/30/2010. Court ordered parties to file Status Report jointly or separately on or before February 4, 2011. Imposition of Sentence set for 2/11/2011 02:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder SAL.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells and David Elden; USPO/PTS Officer-Karen Brewer. Defendant Present In Custody. CC: USM, USPO.
220
12/21/2010
TMB TEXT ORDER DENYING as MOOT 195 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Troy Allen Potzner (1). (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
222
02/04/2011
STATUS REPORT by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner
223
02/08/2011
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner re 222 Status Report. In light of the Status Report filed and Mr. Wells unavailability, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the IOS previously set for 02/11/11 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. A Status Conference is set for 2/17/2011 at 10:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
224
02/17/2011
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Status Conference as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 2/17/2011. Court ordered Mr. Wells to file Status Report re Status of Imposition of Sentence date on or before March 11, 2011. Imposition of Sentence set for 3/18/2011 03:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder SAL.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Karen Brewer. Defendant Present In Custody. CC: USM, USPO.
225
03/14/2011
MOTION to Continue Sentencing, Filed on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
226
03/14/2011
AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Wells by Troy Allen Potzner 225 MOTION to Continue Sentencing, Filed on Shortened Time filed by Troy Allen Potzner
227
03/15/2011
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 225 Unopposed Motion to Continue IOS as to Troy Allen Potzner (1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the IOS previously set for 03/18/11 at 3:30 PM is VACATED AND RESET for 04/08/11 at 9:00 AM before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 3/15/2011 to correct date, and add cc: USM, USPO.
228
04/06/2011
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: In anticipation of the IOS hearing scheduled for 04/08/11 at 9:00 AM IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties confer and file a Status Report by noon on 4/7/2011 advising the Court of the status of this case. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
229
04/07/2011
STATUS REPORT by Troy Allen Potzner Modified on 4/7/2011 to replace pdfs and regenerate NEFs
1
Proposed Order) (Main Document 229 replaced on 4/7/2011) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/7/2011
1 Attachment
230
04/08/2011
MOTION Allow Telephonic Appearance Filed on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
231
04/08/2011
AFFIDAVIT of Steve Wells by Troy Allen Potzner 230 MOTION Allow Telephonic Appearance Filed on Shortened Time filed by Troy Allen Potzner
232
04/08/2011
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess: Status Conference (Imposition of Sentence) as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 4/8/2011.Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2011 at 8:30 AM and Jury Trial set for 5/16/2011 at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. 230 MOTION Allow Telephonic Appearance Filed on Shortened Time filed by Troy Allen Potzner DENIED AS MOOT. (Court Recorder DJE.) Government Counsel-Andrea Stweard; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Karen Brewer. Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO, JC. Modified on 4/8/2011
233
04/26/2011
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference previously set for 05/16/11 at 8:30 AM is VACATED AND RESET for 4/28/2011 at 02:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
234
04/27/2011
MOTION for Telephonic Appearance Filed on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
235
04/27/2011
AFFIDAVIT of Counsel by Troy Allen Potzner 234 MOTION for Telephonic Appearance Filed on Shortened Time filed by Troy Allen Potzner
236
04/27/2011
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 234 Motion for Telephonic Appearance at the Final Pretrial Conference as to Troy Allen Potzner (1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT parties wishing to appear telephonically may call into the Meet-Me-Bridge at (907) 677-6246 on 04/28/11 at 2:00 PM (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
237
04/28/2011
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess: Status Conference (Final Pretrial Conference) as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 4/28/2011. Status Conference set for 5/3/2011 at 11:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder DJE.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells and David Elden (Telephonic); USPO/PTS Officer-Karen Brewer. Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO.
238
05/03/2011
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Status Conference as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 5/3/2011. Defendant's Oral Motion to reset Status Conference hearing for May 4, 2011; GRANTED. Mr. Well's Oral Motion to Allow Mr. Elden to Appear Telephonically for the Status Conference on May 4, 2011 at 8:30 AM; GRANTED. Status Conference set for 5/4/2011 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder SAL.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven M. Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Karen Brewer. Defendant Present In Custody. CC: USM, USPO.
239
05/04/2011
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Status Conference as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 5/4/2011. Defendant's oral motion to set Proposed Change of Plea Hearing GRANTED. Court ordered parties to file plea agreement by 5/13/2011. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2011 09:00 AM is VACATED. Proposed Change of Plea Hearing set for 5/16/2011 12:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder SCD.) Government Counsel-Andrea T. Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Karen Brewer. Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO, JC
240
05/12/2011
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Troy Allen Potzner
241
05/12/2011
SEALED PLEA AGREEMENT ADDENDUM as to Troy Allen Potzner
242
05/16/2011
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Change of Plea Hearing previously set for 05/16/11 at 12:00 PM is VACATED AND RESET for 5/17/2011 at 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
243
05/17/2011
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Change of Plea Hearing as to Troy Allen Potzner held on 5/17/2011. Plea entered by Troy Allen Potzner (1) Guilty Count 1s. NOTICE: No less than seven (7) days prior to the sentencing date, each party shall file a written sentencing memo pursuant to D.AK 32.1(d) and serve opposing counsel and the probation officer, Sentencing set for 6/30/2011 at 1:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. (Court Recorder RMC.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells; USPO/PTS Officer-Karen Brewer. Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO
244
06/16/2011
SECOND REVISED PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Sealed) as to Troy Allen Potzner. This report replaces the revised presentence investigation report filed at docket 212.
1
Second Revised Presentence Report
1 Attachment
245
06/23/2011
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sentencing Memorandum by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
246
06/24/2011
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Troy Allen Potzner
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
2
Exhibit Exhibit B
3
Exhibit Exhibit C
3 Attachments
247
06/24/2011
SEALED SENTENCING MEMORANDUM SUPPLEMENT as to Troy Allen Potzner
248
06/24/2011
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner
249
06/24/2011
SEALED SENTENCING MEMORANDUM SUPPLEMENT as to Troy Allen Potzner
250
06/27/2011
SUPPLEMENT to Sentencing Memorandum by Troy Allen Potzner 246 Sentencing Memorandum filed by Troy Allen Potzner
1
Exhibit Wise Report/Declaration
2
Exhibit Wise CV
3
Exhibit BOP Structure
3 Attachments
251
06/27/2011
Notice to Counsel re 250 Supplement filed by Troy Allen Potzner. A review of the document submitted at dkt 250 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 250. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf header on each page.
252
06/27/2011
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 245 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sentencing Memoranda as to Troy Allen Potzner (1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Sentencing Memorandum filed at Docket 246 is accepted for filing. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
253
06/27/2011
TMB TEXT ORDER as to Troy Allen Potzner. Due to conflicts with a jury trial IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the IOS previously set for 06/30/11 at 1:30 PM is VACATED AND RESET for 7/7/2011 at 01:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Timothy M. Burgess. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
254
06/28/2011
UNOPPOSED MOTION To Reconsider Court's Order to Continue Imposition of Sentence Filed on Shortened Time by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
255
06/28/2011
AFFIDAVIT of Counsel by Troy Allen Potzner 254 UNOPPOSED MOTION To Reconsider Court's Order to Continue Imposition of Sentence Filed on Shortened Time filed by Troy Allen Potzner
256
06/28/2011
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 254 Unopposed Motion to Reset IOS as to Troy Allen Potzner (1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the IOS previously set for 07/07/11 at 1:00 PM is VACATED and RESET for 06/30/11 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
257
06/28/2011
SUPPLEMENT by USA as to Troy Allen Potzner 248 Sentencing Memorandum filed by USA
258
06/30/2011
MOTION to Redact Legally Inadmissible Information from Pre-Sentence Investigation by Troy Allen Potzner.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
259
06/30/2011
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Troy Allen Potzner
260
06/30/2011
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess:Sentencing held on 6/30/2011 for Troy Allen Potzner (1), Counts 1s, 1ss, 2s, 3s, Count 1s: 63 months imprisonment. 5 years supervised release. $100.00 special assessment. Counts 2s and 3s DISMISSED. Count 1ss of Felony Information DISMISSED. Defendant's oral motion to WITHDRAW Amended Motion to SUppress Evidence From Warrantless Search [DKT 70] GRANTED. Defendant's oral motin to WITHDRAW First Motion to Suppress Evidence From Search Warrant [DKT 72] GRANTED. Defendant's oral motion to WITHDRAW Motion to Suppress [DKT 258} DENIED AS MOOT. Court ordered that the Bureau of Prisons conduct a medical assessment of the defendant and file a status report with the court by 09/01/2011 reporting to the court what the Bureau of Prisons medical plan will be on the addressin gthe defendant's knee problem and pain management issues. (Court Recorder CME.) Government Counsel-Andrea Steward; Defense Counsel-Steven Wells and David A. Elden; USPO/PTS Officer-Karen Brewer. Defendant Present In Custody. cc: USM, USPO
261
07/11/2011
JUDGMENT as to Troy Allen Potzner (1) Count 1s: 63 months imprisonment. 5 years supervised release. $100.00 special assessment. Counts 2s and 3s DISMISSED. Count 1ss of Felony Information DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 6/30/2011. cc: USM, USPO, Finance.
262
07/11/2011
Sealed Statement of Reasons as to Troy Allen Potzner. cc: USM, USPO, Finance.
263
07/14/2011
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Troy Allen Potzner; Imposition of Sentence held on 6/30/11 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Court Recorder: CME. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the transcriber, T M Transcribing by calling 907-277-8591. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after Release of Transcript Restriction deadline of 10/11/2011.
264
10/17/2011
NOTICE to Court re Medical Treatment by Troy Allen Potzner
265
01/24/2012
(Public Entry) Docket number 265 is a SEALED ENTRY for a Document that was filed on 1/23/12.
1 Attachment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.