USA v. Pulusila
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00057-60053 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
05/18/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
05/21/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
05/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
05/22/2018
Pretrial Services Report
05/25/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
05/25/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
9
05/25/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
10
05/25/2018
Order of Detention
11
05/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12
06/11/2018
Unopposed Motion
13
06/11/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/12/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
07/27/2018
Order
18
07/27/2018
Order
19
09/10/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
09/12/2018
Plea Agreement
22
09/12/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
23
09/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/14/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
11/06/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
30
11/20/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
01/29/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
33
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
34
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
35
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
36
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
37
02/07/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/08/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/12/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
02/12/2019
Order of Release
42
02/19/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed
43
02/21/2019
Judgment
44
02/21/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.