USA v. Pursifull
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00058 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
60
06/22/2018
Notice (Other)
61
06/22/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
62
06/22/2018
Order of Detention
06/22/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
06/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
07/02/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
07/16/2018
Order - Sealed pdf
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
08/14/2018
Violation Disposition Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.