USA v. Quintana et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00007 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
75
05/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
78
09/13/2018
Notice (Other)
79
09/14/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
09/14/2018
Order Setting Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
09/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
83
09/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
84
09/24/2018
Notice (Other)
85
09/24/2018
Plea Agreement
86
09/24/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
10/23/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
94
10/24/2018
Plea Agreement
95
10/24/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
96
10/30/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
98
11/02/2018
Notice (Other)
11/02/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
103
11/20/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
11/26/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.