USA v. Quintana et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00007-59853 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
114
01/17/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
01/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
124
01/18/2019
Appear
01/21/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
01/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
145
02/25/2019
Plea Agreement
146
02/25/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
147
02/25/2019
Errata
02/27/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
174
04/15/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
182
05/06/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
187
05/13/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
188
05/13/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
05/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
190
05/17/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
191
05/17/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
192
05/17/2019
Supplement
05/20/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.