USA v. Quintana et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00007-59855 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
124
01/18/2019
Appear
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
01/25/2019
Order
134
01/28/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
135
01/28/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
01/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
138
01/29/2019
Plea Agreement
139
01/29/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
02/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.