USA v. Quintana et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00007-59858 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
124
01/18/2019
Appear
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
01/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
157
02/28/2019
Errata

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.