USA v. Rainey et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2005-cr-00108-811 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
712
10/04/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
713
10/05/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
10/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
716
10/22/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
717
10/22/2018
Notice (Other)
718
10/22/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
719
10/31/2018
Summons Returned Executed
720
12/10/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
722
01/09/2019
Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release
723
01/15/2019
Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Bail Review Hearing
724
01/16/2019
Order on Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Bail Review Hearing
01/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.