USA v. Rainey et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2005-cr-00108-816 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
726
01/17/2019
Continue
01/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
735
03/11/2019
Response in Opposition
737
03/20/2019
Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.