USA v. Rastopsoff
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2004-cr-00143 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
77
10/02/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned -JDR Retired (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
10/02/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
10/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/04/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
12/12/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
85
12/12/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
12/12/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
12/13/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
89
12/13/2018
Notice (Other)
90
12/13/2018
Order of Detention

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.