USA v. Ravn
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00137-61000 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
4
11/19/2018
Pretrial Services Report
11/19/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/19/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
7
11/19/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
8
11/19/2018
Order of Detention
9
12/07/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
10
12/12/2018
Unopposed Motion
11
12/12/2018
Unopposed Motion
12
12/19/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
02/22/2019
Order
18
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
19
03/08/2019
Status Report
03/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
03/08/2019
Unopposed Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.