USA v. Rawls
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00070 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
41
05/24/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
42
05/24/2018
Order
43
11/06/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
44
11/07/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
11/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
11/27/2018
Subsequent Summons for Offender - 12C
11/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
11/28/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
49
11/28/2018
Notice (Other)
50
11/28/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.