USA v. Rawls
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00070-53872 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
41
05/24/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
42
05/24/2018
Order
43
11/06/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
44
11/07/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
11/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
11/27/2018
Subsequent Summons for Offender - 12C
11/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
11/28/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
49
11/28/2018
Notice (Other)
50
11/28/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
51
12/13/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
52
12/19/2018
Summons Returned Executed
53
02/21/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
02/21/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/21/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/21/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
03/12/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/13/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
04/05/2019
Subsequent Petition for Offender - 12C - Sealed pdf
04/10/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
04/11/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
63
04/11/2019
Order of Detention
64
04/11/2019
Order of Release
04/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
04/17/2019
Violation Disposition Report
68
04/19/2019
Continue
04/19/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.