USA v. Reddig
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00065 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
39
06/21/2018
Transcript
40
07/27/2018
Application for Writ of Execution on Permanent Fund Dividend
07/30/2018
Writ Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
08/31/2018
PFD Writ Returned
42
11/06/2018
PFD Writ Returned

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.