USA v. Reed et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00033-59517 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
29
05/24/2018
Unopposed Motion
05/25/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
06/19/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Bail Review Hearing
33
06/19/2018
Order on Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Bail Review Hearing
06/26/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
06/26/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
36
06/27/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 Request No Action
37
06/28/2018
Order
40
06/29/2018
Summons Returned Executed
07/02/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
07/03/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
44
07/03/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
45
07/03/2018
Order of Detention
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
07/05/2018
Summons Returned Executed
49
07/10/2018
Plea Agreement
50
07/10/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
51
07/10/2018
Plea Agreement
52
07/10/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
07/11/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
07/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
58
08/20/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
59
08/20/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
61
09/10/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
62
09/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
63
09/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
64
09/17/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
65
09/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
66
09/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
67
09/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
68
09/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
69
09/18/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
70
09/18/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
71
09/19/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
72
09/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
73
09/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
74
09/19/2018
Errata
09/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
78
09/21/2018
Notice (Other)
79
09/21/2018
Notice (Other)
09/21/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
09/23/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
09/27/2018
Judgment
85
09/27/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
86
09/28/2018
Memorandum
10/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
09/28/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
91
11/01/2018
Judgment
92
11/01/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
93
01/16/2019
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
01/23/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
01/24/2019
Appear
01/25/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
05/20/2019
Order
05/21/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
102
05/21/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.