USA v. Reedy
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00054-59846 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
05/22/2018
Unopposed Motion
10
05/22/2018
Unopposed Motion
05/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
05/25/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
05/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
06/13/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
18
07/30/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
07/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
08/07/2018
Plea Agreement
21
08/07/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
08/10/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
09/19/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
25
10/10/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
26
10/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
27
10/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
28
10/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
29
10/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
10/24/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/31/2018
Judgment
33
10/31/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.