USA v. Richardson et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00087 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
92
05/21/2018
Continue
93
05/21/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
05/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
08/29/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
97
09/04/2018
Unopposed Motion
99
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
100
09/20/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
101
09/20/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
09/20/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
102
09/20/2018
File Excess Pages
105
09/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
106
09/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
107
09/26/2018
Continue
108
09/26/2018
Declaration
109
09/27/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
110
09/27/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
09/28/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
114
10/04/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
115
10/04/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
116
10/11/2018
Unopposed Motion
117
10/11/2018
Affidavit
118
10/15/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
119
10/18/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.