USA v. Richardson et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00087-58186 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
127
01/11/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
128
01/11/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
129
01/11/2019
Supplement
132
01/14/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
133
01/14/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
134
01/16/2019
Unopposed Motion
135
01/16/2019
Declaration
01/17/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
147
02/01/2019
Judgment
148
02/01/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
150
02/07/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
02/08/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.