USA v. Riedel-Byler et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00008 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
269
06/21/2018
USCA Order
270
07/26/2018
USCA Order
271
08/03/2018
USCA Mandate
272
08/28/2018
Release of Funds
273
08/29/2018
Order on Motion for Release of Funds
274
09/14/2018
Notice (Other)
275
10/11/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
10/22/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
277
11/02/2018
Notice (Other)
278
11/06/2018
PFD Writ Returned

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.