USA v. Riggins et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00075 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
161
10/10/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
10/10/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned -JDR Retired (Text entry; no document attached.)
163
10/10/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
166
10/17/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
167
10/17/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
168
10/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
169
10/25/2018
Notice (Other)
170
10/31/2018
Summons Returned Executed
11/15/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
175
11/27/2018
Order of Detention
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.