USA v. Riggins et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00075-48284 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
161
10/10/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
10/10/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned -JDR Retired (Text entry; no document attached.)
163
10/10/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
166
10/17/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
167
10/17/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
168
10/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
169
10/25/2018
Notice (Other)
170
10/31/2018
Summons Returned Executed
11/15/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
175
11/27/2018
Order of Detention
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
179
12/18/2018
Violation Disposition Report
180
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12/20/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
182
01/08/2019
Judgment on Revocation
183
01/08/2019
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
04/29/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
189
04/30/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
190
04/30/2019
Order of Detention
05/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
192
05/02/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
193
05/06/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
194
05/08/2019
Violation Disposition Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.