USA v. Riley
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2009-cr-00047 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
425
05/21/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
426
05/22/2018
USCA Case Number
427
05/25/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
06/01/2018
Docket Annotation re Duplicate Filing (Text entry; no document attached.)
428
06/01/2018
USCA Order
429
06/08/2018
Order
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Appeal Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.