USA v. Riley
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2009-cr-00047-14150 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
425
05/21/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
426
05/22/2018
USCA Case Number
427
05/25/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
06/01/2018
Docket Annotation re Duplicate Filing (Text entry; no document attached.)
428
06/01/2018
USCA Order
429
06/08/2018
Order
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Appeal Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
430
01/08/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
431
01/29/2019
Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment
432
02/05/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
433
02/26/2019
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
434
02/26/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
435
02/27/2019
USCA Case Number
436
03/06/2019
USCA Order
437
03/13/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.