USA v. Risinger
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2006-cr-00023-1729 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
69
01/08/2019
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
70
01/08/2019
Order
72
02/22/2019
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
02/22/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
02/26/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
02/26/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
02/26/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
77
02/26/2019
Notice (Other)
78
02/26/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
79
02/26/2019
Order of Release
02/28/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
03/11/2019
Appearance Bond
88
03/11/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
89
03/11/2019
Order of Release
90
03/11/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
91
03/12/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
03/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/18/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/18/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
Receipt for Funds (Text entry; no document attached.)
94
03/28/2019
Continue
95
03/28/2019
Declaration
03/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
05/03/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.