USA v. Robinson et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00129 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
74
06/13/2018
DEPS Notice
06/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
06/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
06/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
08/09/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
84
08/10/2018
Plea Agreement
85
08/10/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
08/10/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
09/10/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
09/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
09/17/2018
Plea Agreement
91
09/17/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
92
09/17/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
94
09/27/2018
Continue
10/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
10/02/2018
Plea Agreement
97
10/02/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/03/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
11/07/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
101
11/19/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
102
11/26/2018
Continue
103
11/29/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
12/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
12/06/2018
Continue
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
108
12/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
109
12/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
110
12/07/2018
Unopposed Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.