USA v. Robles-Orozco
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00005 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/21/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
114
05/23/2018
Transcript - SEALED
115
05/25/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
116
05/31/2018
Judgment
117
05/31/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
118
07/19/2018
Forfeiture of Property
119
07/19/2018
Affidavit
120
07/24/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.