USA v. Rodriguez
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00031 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
67
06/18/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
68
06/18/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
06/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
08/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
08/24/2018
Status Report
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
10/23/2018
Continue
75
10/23/2018
Affidavit
10/25/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.