USA v. Rodriguez
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00031-57162 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
67
06/18/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
68
06/18/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
06/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
08/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
08/24/2018
Status Report
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
10/23/2018
Continue
75
10/23/2018
Affidavit
10/25/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
12/21/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
78
12/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
79
12/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
80
12/29/2018
Continue
81
12/29/2018
Affidavit
12/31/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
01/14/2019
Continue
84
01/14/2019
Affidavit
01/15/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
01/29/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
01/29/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
02/07/2019
Continue
02/08/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
02/22/2019
Supplement
03/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
03/11/2019
Supplement
96
03/11/2019
Notice (Other)
97
03/11/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.